U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standingrock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order for Warrant ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2021
  • June 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 05, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.