U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ball
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Letter - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [USCA Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.