U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:19-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDevitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • March 12, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.