U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.