U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kugler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.