U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redwolf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.