U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 21, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.