U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammontree et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.