U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Layne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Remark - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.