U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jessop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.