U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 10, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.