U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:04-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Fennen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 08, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • May 05, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 04, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 26, 2021: [Appear]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Vacate]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.