U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order to Locate Counsel - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appear]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.