U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bramley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.