U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eisinger et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Stipulation - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.