U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miranda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Prob/SR (Form 34 and 35) - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.