U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.