U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCune
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.