U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Remark - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 11, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 10, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.