U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Vacate]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.