U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00107-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Santos-Antunez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.