U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Badbear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Mail Returned - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Letter - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.