U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.