U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:08-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DiFrancesco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2023: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 25, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 23, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • July 20, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.