U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williamson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.