U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamere
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.