U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 16, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.