U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haslage et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Probation/Supervised Release Transfer Out Notification]
  • January 24, 2022: [Remark - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.