U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Applegate
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.