U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardesty et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Suppress ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Revoke]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.