U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Referring Motion upon Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.