U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Answer to 2255 Motion - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.