U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Margiotta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • July 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 01, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.