U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10027-
  • Case Name: CODY GENE JACKSON and ANNE JEANNETTE MERCADO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Sell]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval - BK]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.