U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.