U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clement
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • July 30, 2021: [Appear]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.