U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:07-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dietz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Remark - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.