U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brasda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 13, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.