U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2021
  • May 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.