U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bahr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 10, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • April 05, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.