U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.