U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Revoke]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 21, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 06, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.