U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kaupang
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 15, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.