U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ludwig
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.