U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fischer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.