U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shostak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 05, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury Notes ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Exhibits - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Witness List - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury List ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Suppress ]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.