U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Viers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.