U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baroun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.