U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Remark - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 09, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.