U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lords
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Remark - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Referring Motion upon Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.